+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-158.
- Signed by President.
On November 9, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 3, 1983 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to House amendments by Voice Vote.
On September 27, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 23, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On May 20, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On May 19, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 203.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 3, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor