+ − Actions (12)
On August 20, 1981 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-43.
- Signed by President.
On August 12, 1981 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 4, 1981 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On July 31, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On July 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 244.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 9, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor