+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On September 30, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-102.
- Signed by President.
On September 21, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 15, 1983 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 2, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 25, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On April 21, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On April 19, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 95.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 13, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor