+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 1, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-131.
- Signed by President.
On October 20, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 18, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
On October 15, 1993 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-294.
On October 13, 1993 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
On September 16, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
On July 22, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On July 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On July 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 141.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 103-96.
On June 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 17, 1993 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On May 13, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
On April 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On March 31, 1993 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor