+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 1983 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 98-15.
- Signed by President.
On March 25, 1983 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 24, 1983 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 24, 1983 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On March 24, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 21, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On March 18, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On March 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 56.
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor