+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- By Senator Hatch from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/22/04. Report No. 108-334 . Minority and Supplemental views filed.
On July 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Property Rights. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
- Committee on the Judiciary referred to Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Property Rights.
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor