+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On November 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-624.
- Signed by President.
On October 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On October 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 1, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 14, 1988 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor