+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 19, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-342.
- Signed by President.
On June 12, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On June 10, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On June 2, 1986 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On May 22, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.854 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole.
- H.AMDT.854 Amendment Offered by Representative Garcia. An amendment to make technical changes.
On May 21, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 15, 1986 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.854
An amendment to make technical changes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor