+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate passed companion measure H.J.Res. 87 in lieu of this measure by Voice Vote.
- Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 412.
- Measure laid before Senate by motion.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39.
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate.
On June 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 107-159 .
On June 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held and concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 107-483.
On May 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor