+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 9, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On October 8, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On October 7, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On October 6, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 804.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with amendments and with a preamble. With written report No. 102-456.
On October 3, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On October 2, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor