+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 15, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-569.
- Signed by President.
On November 9, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 5, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 25, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 23, 1990 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Committee on House Administration discharged.
- Mr. Frost moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
- Mr. Gillmor demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On July 17, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
On July 13, 1990 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
- Received in the House.
On July 10, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On June 27, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 660.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford without amendment. With written report No. 101-346.
On June 13, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 17, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor