+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On June 18, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-319.
- Signed by President.
On June 13, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On June 6, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On May 24, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On May 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On May 17, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 886.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 8, 1984 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor