+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On July 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-348.
- Signed by President.
On June 28, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On June 26, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On June 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On June 7, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 966.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On April 24, 1984 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor