+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On October 16, 1985 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-124.
- Signed by President.
On October 10, 1985 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 9, 1985 in the House:
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Cleared for White House.
- Cleared for White House.
On September 23, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On September 19, 1985 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 12, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor