+ − Summary
+ − Actions (20)
On October 7, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-449.
- Signed by President.
On September 26, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 25, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 23, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 18, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 198.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 99-836.
On September 16, 1986 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On August 7, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 24, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On September 17, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On September 16, 1985 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On September 12, 1985 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 292.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 11, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor