+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On July 19, 1985 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 99-67.
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On July 18, 1985 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 18, 1985 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On July 18, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 17, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On July 16, 1985 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 27, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor