+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 10, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-32.
- Signed by President.
On June 29, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On June 28, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On June 27, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On June 25, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On May 15, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 96-187.
On March 26, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On January 18, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor