+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 6, 2002 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 107-209.
- Signed by President.
On July 26, 2002 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 25, 2002 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 24, 2002 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate concurred in House amendment, preamble amendment and amendment to the title by Unanimous Consent.
On July 23, 2002 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On July 22, 2002 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate S.J. Res. 13 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
On July 19, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-595 .
On July 17, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
On December 19, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On December 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On December 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on the joint resolution.
On April 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor