+ − Actions (19)
On August 20, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-240.
- Signed by President.
On August 10, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 5, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On December 28, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On December 14, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On December 11, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the preamble by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.785 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.785 Proposed by Senator Hayakawa. To make certain corrections and clarifications regarding the number, problems, and contributions of service connected disabled veterans.
On December 3, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 397.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On December 1, 1981 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.641 Referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary. To make certain corrections and clarifications regarding the number, problems, and contributions of service connected disabled veterans.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On November 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.641
To make certain corrections and clarifications regarding the number, problems, and contributions of service connected disabled veterans.
S.UP.AMDT.785
To make certain corrections and clarifications regarding the number, problems, and contributions of service connected disabled veterans.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor