+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 8, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-137.
- Signed by President.
On November 4, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 2, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Mr. Wynn asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
On November 1, 1993 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On October 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 253.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor