+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On June 18, 1991 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 102-60.
- Signed by President.
On June 14, 1991 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On June 13, 1991 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On June 12, 1991 in the House:
- Mr. Bryant asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Judiciary discharged.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On May 29, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On May 23, 1991 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On May 22, 1991 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 22, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor