+ − Actions (17)
On September 15, 1982 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On June 8, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 658.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-465.
On March 10, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On December 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On December 7, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On November 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On November 12, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On November 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On November 4, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On October 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On October 14, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On October 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
On September 23, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Constitution.
On September 21, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor