+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 1991 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 102-39.
- Signed by President.
On April 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On April 24, 1991 in the House:
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On April 22, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 18, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On April 17, 1991 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 21, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor