+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 19, 1995 in the House:
- A similar measure H. Con. Res. 91 was laid on the table without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Gilman asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on International Relations discharged.
On September 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights.
On September 6, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On September 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On August 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor