+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 21, 1989 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 19, 1989 in the House:
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On June 14, 1989 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On June 13, 1989 in the House:
- H.AMDT.56 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Bates. Amendment reduced the number of copies authorized under the resolution from 16,200 to 16,000.
- Committee on House Administration discharged.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Bates asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- H.AMDT.56 On agreeing to the Bates amendment Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 5, 1989 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
- Received in the House.
On June 2, 1989 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 18, 1989 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 63.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford without amendment. Without written report.
On May 17, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 9, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Rules.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.56
Amendment reduced the number of copies authorized under the resolution from 16,200 to 16,000.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor