+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 1, 1976 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On August 30, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On August 10, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1411.
On June 1, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On May 24, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 21, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-912.
On May 4, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor