+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 8, 2006 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On December 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
On July 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 542.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 109-299 .
On May 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 109-157.
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor