+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On April 25, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-18.
- Signed by President.
On April 14, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On April 14, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On April 10, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House in lieu of H.R. 4224 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On March 24, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On March 20, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy, S. Rept. 94-50.
On March 6, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Atomic Energy.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor