+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
On June 13, 1994 in the House:
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On May 12, 1994 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On May 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 85-14.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1687 Proposed amendment withdrawn in Senate.
- S.AMDT.1687 Proposed by Senator Stevens. To authorize a rural water sanitation-health technology fund to make grants for technologies to improve sanitation conditions on Indian reservations and in Alaska Native villages and in other rural places, to eliminate the "honey bucket" sewage disposal method through innovative technologies, and for other purposes.
- Considered by Senate.
On May 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1686 Proposed by Senator Baucus. To provide a complete substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1688 Amendment SP 1688 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1686 Amendment SP 1686 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1688 Proposed by Senator Baucus for Senator Kerrey. To add a proposed new safeguard.
On October 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Baucus with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-156.
On July 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 103-163.
On May 18, 1993 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendments (3)
S.AMDT.1686
To provide a complete substitute.
S.AMDT.1687
To authorize a rural water sanitation-health technology fund to make grants for technologies to improve sanitation conditions on Indian reservations and in Alaska Native villages and in other rural places, to eliminate the "honey bucket" sewage disposal method through innovative technologies, and for other purposes.
S.AMDT.1688
To add a proposed new safeguard.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor