+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-141 .
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-828.
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-603.
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor