+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 2, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-43.
- Signed by President.
- Measure presented to President.
On August 1, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On August 1, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On July 31, 1979 in the House:
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #406 .
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
- Cleared for White House
On July 26, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 96-390.
On June 21, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On June 19, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On June 13, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 96-212.
On April 10, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor