+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 12, 1978 in the House:
- Measure failed of passage in House under suspension of rules, roll call #901 .
- Measure considered in House.
On October 10, 1978 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On September 28, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1654 .
On July 10, 1978 in the House:
- Referred jointly to House Committees on Interstate and Foreign Commerce; and the Judiciary.
On June 29, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On September 21, 1977 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
On June 27, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On May 16, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation with amendment, S. Rept. 95-210.
On March 9, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor