+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-29.
- Signed by President.
On July 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 224). (text: 07/26/2021 CR H3883)
On July 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 224).(text: 07/26/2021 CR H3883)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3931-3932)
On July 26, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 957.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3883-3884)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2153)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2153)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2152-2153)
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Amendment SA 1459 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Amendment SA 1459 proposed by Senator Kennedy. (consideration: CR S2153; text: CR S2153) In the nature of a substitute.
- Senate amendment submitted
- Senate amendment agreed to: Amendment SA 1459 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate amendment proposed (on the floor): Amendment SA 1459 proposed by Senator Kennedy.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 1459
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.1459
In the nature of a substitute.