+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 1996 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.3136 .
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Small Business
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On March 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100-0.
On March 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate.
- S.AMDT.3534 Proposed by Senator Bond. To provide for a substitute.
- S.AMDT.3535 Amendment SP 3535 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3535 Proposed by Senator Nickles to Amendment SP 3534. To ensure economy and efficiency of Federal Government operations by establishing a moratorium on regulatory rulemaking actions, and for other purposes.
- S.AMDT.3534 Amendment SP 3534 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
- Committee on Small Business. Reported to Senate by Senator Bond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Committee on Small Business. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee on Small Business. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 104-443.
On June 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.3534
To provide for a substitute.
S.AMDT.3535
To ensure economy and efficiency of Federal Government operations by establishing a moratorium on regulatory rulemaking actions, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor