+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Risk Management, Research and Specialty Crops.
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to House Science
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2862 Amendment SA 2862 proposed by Senator Crapo for Senator Murkowski. In the nature of a substitute.
- Considered by Senate.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2862 Amendment SA 2862 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
On October 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 310.
- Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Lugar with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-179 .
On July 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Agriculture. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-203.
On April 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2862
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor