+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 11, 2003 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-123.
- Signed by President.
On October 30, 2003 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 28, 2003 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 926 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Davis, Jo Ann moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 16, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization.
On September 3, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Received in the House.
On September 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. With written report No. 108-109 . Additional views filed.
On June 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor