+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-285.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 533.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-299.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor