+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-278.
- Signed by President.
On May 2, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On May 2, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On May 1, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On March 30, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 95-1006.
On October 28, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On October 27, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On October 20, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 95-521.
On March 4, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor