+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 6, 1979 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On December 5, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On November 14, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 2063 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On August 1, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended , roll call #242 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On July 27, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-270.
- Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works with amendment, S. Rept. 96-270.
On April 5, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works.
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor