+ − Actions (31)
On October 6, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-285.
- Signed by President.
On September 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 22, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to House amendment. By Voice Vote.
On September 14, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 493.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 97-803.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 9, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 21, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Crime.
On May 24, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On May 21, 1982 in the House:
- Considered by House Senate Request for the Return of Papers Agreed to.
On May 12, 1982 in the House:
- Secretary of the Senate was ordered to request the return of the engrossed copy of S.907 from the House of Representatives; Further, if the House were to comply with the request, the Secretary was ordered to make a certain change before the reengrossment and return to the House.
On May 5, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
On March 10, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 455.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 97-320.
On February 2, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On December 2, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Incorporated provisions of S.904 in measure, approved for full committee consideration.
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On June 17, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from U.S. Attorney General.
On May 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Considered by Committee on Judiciary.
On April 20, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from U.S. Attorney General.
On April 15, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On April 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor