+ − Actions (6)
On December 2, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Provisions of measure incorporated into measure S.907 , approved for full committee consideration.
On September 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On July 6, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Office of U.S. Attorney General.
On April 20, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Office of U.S. Attorney General.
On April 15, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On April 7, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor