+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-489.
On November 3, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 24, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 893 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Bono moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 2, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On September 29, 2000 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On September 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 29, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
On September 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 830.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 106-421 .
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor