+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Received in the House.
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.Amdt.769 Amendment SA 769 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.769 Amendment SA 769 proposed by Senator Wicker for Senator Fischer. (consideration: CR S4819; text: CR S4819) In the nature of substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4819)
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 113.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-90.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 769
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.769
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.