+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on the reported bill.
On October 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 953.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 106-509 . Additional views filed.
On September 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Hearings held.
On April 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor