+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 14, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Received in the House.
On December 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4363 Amendment SA 4363 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4363 Amendment SA 4363 proposed by Senator Grams for Senator Collins. To provide for Inspectors General to propose and submit annual budget estimates, make technical corrections, and for other purposes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On October 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- By Senator Thompson from Committee on Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 106-510 .
On October 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 919.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Thompson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On September 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
On April 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4363
To provide for Inspectors General to propose and submit annual budget estimates, make technical corrections, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor