+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 22, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Private Law No: 106-18.
On November 13, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 27, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered from the Private Calendar.
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
On October 11, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-960 .
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 23.
On October 10, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims Discharged.
On October 2, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
On September 29, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On September 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor