+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-633.
- Signed by President.
On October 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 20, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On October 19, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 12, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 30, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1032.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-568.
On September 22, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On January 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Favorable.
On December 17, 1987 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On July 27, 1987 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held at Santa Fe, New Mexico.
On July 9, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, Department of Agriculture, Army Corps of Engineers, Office of Management and Budget.
On March 26, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor