+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 26, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On May 25, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 16, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 151.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias with an amendment. With written report No. 98-95.
On May 12, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On April 20, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
On March 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor