+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 28, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-295.
- Signed by President.
On May 19, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 7, 1992 in the House:
- Pursuant to the provisions of S. Con. Res. 116 , enrollment corrections have been made.
On April 13, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 9, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
On April 7, 1992 in the House:
- The House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 4712 . Agreed to without objection.
- Committee on Education and Labor discharged.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Pastor asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- A similar measure H.R. 4712 was laid on the table without objection.
- The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of S. 838 .
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 26, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
On November 12, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Received in the House.
On November 12, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 7, 1991 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1309 Proposed by Senator Dodd. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1309 Amendment SP 1309 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 96-0.
On September 27, 1991 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Kennedy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-164.
On July 31, 1991 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 9, 1991 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Children, Family, Drugs, Alcohol. Hearings held.
On May 6, 1991 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Children, Family, Drugs, Alcohol.
On April 17, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1309
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor