+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 16, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-1289.
On October 18, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Office of the U.S. Attorney General.
On April 20, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Office of the U.S. Attorney General.
On April 15, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure.
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Security and Terrorism.
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On March 14, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor